Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Gomez, Olivia, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Adams , John W, Jr, Johnson , John Eamon, against Florida Insurance Guaranty Association, represented by Amos , Kenneth E., Jr, Garnett , Matthew Stanley, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Barbas, Rex presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarbas, Rex Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING JERRY JARAMILLO'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE |
|
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SEAL COURT DOCUMENTS ATTACHED |
|
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
JUDGE'S INSTRUCTIONS-INFORMATION ONLY GRANTED |
|
September 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY NON PARTY JOHN W ADAMS |
|
September 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
EMERGENCY MOTION FOR CONTIUANCE |
|
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED 9/5/2019 DEFT FLORIDA INS GUARANTY ASSOC, INC . |
|
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AND REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING |
|
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED 9/5/2019 DEFT ADA OLIVIA |
|
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFLICT | |
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.