Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Estep, Jennifer, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Mercury Insurance Co Of Florida, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Levens, P. William presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE New File Sent to R/C |
|
August 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC s.t |
|
December 04, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
November 27, 2013 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL | |
September 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONFLICT OF TRIAL DATE OF OCTOBER 28, 2013 |
|
August 08, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES | |
July 31, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT | |
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event | WITNESS LIST | |
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT LIST | |
May 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONFLICT DANIEL A. SHAPIRO, ESQ / OF TRIAL DATE OF OCTOBER 28, 2013 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.