Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gmac Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Fuentes, Marco T, Pita, Yodeisy, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Timberlane Homeowners Association Inc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Judge, Senior presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Nonhomestead -2- $50,000 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
October 16, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
August 20, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
August 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
DEPOSIT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE ACCOUNT BALANCE PAID $ 84,835.00 + CLERK FEES $ 1,347.00 + DOC STAMPS $ 625.10 |
|
August 09, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
August 09, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
August 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Fee Worksheet | |
August 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
DEPOSIT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE ACCOUNT GOOD FAITH DEPOSIT $ 4,465.00 |
|
August 08, 2013 | Docket Event | BID INFORMATION SHEET | |
July 30, 2013 | Docket Event | FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.