Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jp Morgan Chase Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Chorny, Ronald, Morganwoods Greentree Inc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Isom, R. Claudia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Nonhomestead -2- $50,000 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2013 | Docket Event | FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC | |
May 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE New File going to R/C for Storage. |
|
September 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL ORDER REFFERING PARTIES TO MEDIATION |
|
August 21, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION | |
August 13, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL | |
March 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ENTERED UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1 NKA RAYMOND COLON; UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2 NKA ROZANN COATES |
|
March 30, 2012 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE | |
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2 NKA ROXANN COATES 1/7/12 |
|
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1 NKA RAYMOND COLON 1/7/12 |
|
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED RONALD CHORNY 1/13/12 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.