Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Steele, Stacy S, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Mangroves Bar & Grill Inc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Levens, P. William presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2013 | Docket Event | FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC | |
October 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE New File Transfer to R/C; Boxed 10/07/13 |
|
April 10, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
April 10, 2013 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
March 14, 2013 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF DESIGNATION |
|
February 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF RECORD CUSTODIAN FOR TRINITY SURGERY CENTER SCHEDULED FOR 2/25/13 9AM |
|
February 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITY |
|
February 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION RC: 02/25/13 @ 9:00AM |
|
February 15, 2013 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.