Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Cc-Converted, filed a(n) Liens - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Judge, Not. Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2010 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeLiens |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED FINANCIAL HISTORY Fund Date Invoice Interface Amount GLActivity Description P00631 12/08/2010 _______ F0003288 ______577.63 Credit 10-PP-000030 P00631 02/09/2011 I0351356 300557 ______577.63 Debit WARREN, J Judge: Judge, Not. Assigned |
|
December 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT SD800 - CLOSED LOG FILE. USER ID=FIDUCIA Judge: Judge, Not. Assigned |
|
December 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT RCPT - RECEIPT. 08-DEC-2010,$608.29, User Id = CASTILLOC, Receipt No = 1951798. USER ID=CASTILLOC Judge: Judge, Not. Assigned |
|
December 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=RODRIGZ Judge: Judge, Not. Assigned |
|
December 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
BOND TO RELEASE MOTOR VEHICLE LIEN FS 559-917 MOTOR VEHICLE BOND IN THE AMOUNT OF $577.63. USER ID=FIDUCIA Judge: Judge, Not. Assigned |
|
December 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF BOND FILED USER ID=FIDUCIA Judge: Judge, Not. Assigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.