Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
U.S.Bank National Association.Dept Foreclosure Select Portfolio Servicing Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Bank Of America Nac O President, Vp, Hay, Shawn, Nassau Pointe Homeowners Assn, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Levens, P. William presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLevens, P. William Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION TEAM Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT entered in error Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
November 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE Circuit Civil New Disposal to be sent to the R/C is in a box by the R/C pick up area. Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
October 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL
Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
October 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE COPY OF ORDER OF DISMISSAL TO SHAWN HAY Judge: Levens, P. William |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.