Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Capler, Sharon, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Tran, My Loan Thi Van, Tran, Kien, State Farm Fire And Casualty Companyc O Chief Financial Officer, Ra, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Silver, C. Bernard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSilver, C. Bernard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event | FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC | |
May 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE New Disposal file in transit to the Record Center- Pick-up Date 5/28/2013 |
|
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL | |
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
August 31, 2012 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
March 21, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE | |
March 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
SEE DOCKET TEXT CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY |
|
March 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITY |
|
March 08, 2012 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
November 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION MARCH 15, 2012 1:00 PM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.