Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Financial System Florida, Incc O Corporation Service Co, R.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Jordan, Paul C, Jordan, Janie E, Rbs Citizens, N.A., Aberdeen Creek Hoa Inc, Suntrust Bank, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Judge, Senior presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Senior Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2010 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED FINANCIAL HISTORY Fund Date Invoice Interface Amount GLActivity Description F07316 06/20/2012 _______ Y0000660 ____10000.00 Credit 10-CA-024414 F07316 06/21/2012 _______ Y0000661 ___186100.00 Credit 10-CA-024414 Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
May 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
UNCLAIMED FUNDS SENT TO DEPT OF FINANCIAL SVC PER FS 717.113
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
October 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER DISBURSING FUNDS DISTRIBUTION OF SURPLUS FUNDS AFTER FORECLOSURE SALE / ORDERED 10-11-2012 DCE Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
October 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
October 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE RETURNED TO HOME LOCATION - RC Circuit Civil Disposal to be sent to the R/C is in a box by the R/C pick up area. Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
September 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
September 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN REQUESTING DEPT - CIRCUIT CIVIL
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
September 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - SEND TO CIRCUIT CIVIL GWEN REDDICK Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
September 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Judge, Senior |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.