Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
New York Community Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Panagia, Robert, Asset Acceptance Llc, Dept Of Housing And Urban Development400 N Tampa St Ste 3200, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Judge, Senior presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Senior Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
September 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE New Disposal Sent to R/C Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
SEE DOCKET TEXT DO NOT ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION PER ATTY'S OFFICE. RETURN TO THEM UNEXECUTED ISSUES ARE RESOLVED.. USER ID=HIPSON Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
September 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT ROPEN - CASE REOPENED. USER ID=RODRIGZ Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
September 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE A WRIT OF POSSESSION. USER ID=MANNTI Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
July 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS USER ID=PATERSNF Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
July 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE USER ID=PATERSNF Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
July 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING USER ID=PATERSNF Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
June 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE USER ID=MARTINEZGL Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
June 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT RCPT - RECEIPT. 23-JUN-2011,$70.00, User Id = CARVALHORE, Receipt No = 2069128. USER ID=CARVALHORE Judge: Judge, Senior |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.