Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Perez, Bernardo, Perez, Liz, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Cooperativa De Seguros Multiples De Puerto Rico, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Pendino, D. Sam presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2010 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event | FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC | |
May 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE New Disposal file in transit to the Record Center- Pick-up Date 5/28/2013 |
|
July 02, 2012 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL | |
July 02, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
July 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO JUDGE FROM HOWARD H WEBER, ESQ. Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
May 17, 2012 | Docket Event | MEDIATION RESULTS REPORT | |
May 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES 2ND SET |
|
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED X'S 1/COS DATE 5/1/12 |
|
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE A SUBPOENA UNDER RULE 1.351 FLA.R.CIV.P FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS |
|
April 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES RE MEDIATION AUTHORITY UNVERIFIED/SECOND SET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.