Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hayward Baker Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Gianino, John D, Gianino, Terri L, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Wolfe, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2010 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION TEAM Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
May 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE New Disposal file in transit to the Record Center- Pick-up Date 5/28/2013 Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
February 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=RODRIGZ Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
February 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS W/CHECK No. 9182. USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
February 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.