Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Friesen, James Matthew, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Camejo, Yarisel Ortega, Vilas, Yamilia Camejo, Geico Indemnity Company, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Silver, C. Bernard presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2010 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
May 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE New Disposal file in transit to the Record Center- Pick-up Date 5/28/2013 Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
April 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
April 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
March 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
MEDIATION RESULTS REPORT FULL SETTLEMENT Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
February 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST OF DEFT Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEMAND FOR JUDGMENT PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR JUDGMENT PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
February 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST 1ST Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
February 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.