Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Deutsche Bank Trust Co Americas, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Quezada, Diana P, Quezada, Mauricio, Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc1901 E Voorhees St., Ste. C, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Cook, J.. Martha presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2010 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
May 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE New Disposal file in transit to the Record Center- Pick-up Date 5/28/2013 Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO CLERK FROM KYM WAITE Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM BEFORE HEARING Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.