Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Td Ameritrade Inc, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case against Goldfield, Kristina, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Foster, A. Robert presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2010 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: November 06, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
PAPER CASE FILE DESTROYED - DIGITIZED Paper document converted to electronic image(s) destroyed per requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.525(c)(2)(B); (c)(2)(F); and (c)(4) Judge: Foster, A. Robert |
|
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION AFTER HEARING
Judge: Foster, A. Robert |
|
August 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION 11/14/17 AT 8:45 AM Judge: Foster, A. Robert |
|
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC--- IMAGED FILE
Judge: Foster, A. Robert |
|
May 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
CASE IMAGE AND VERIFIED AS OF THIS DATE
Judge: Foster, A. Robert |
|
April 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING APRIL 15, 2015 / ROOM 524 Judge: Foster, A. Robert |
|
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Judge: Foster, A. Robert |
|
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 4/15/15 10AM Judge: Foster, A. Robert |
|
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL OF HARRY LEE COE AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FROM THE RESPONDENT KRISTINA GOLDFIELD 12/18/14 MJC Judge: Foster, A. Robert |
|
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR AWARDING ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS AGAINST RESPONDENT KRISTINA GOLDFIELD Judge: Foster, A. Robert |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.