Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Riordan, Eileen, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Turkscap Apartments Ltd, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Bergmann, E. Charles presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2010 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event | FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC | |
May 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE New Disposal file in transit to the Record Center- Pick-up Date 5/28/2013 |
|
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=RODRIGZ |
|
September 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL W/ PREJ. USER ID=NEWSOMEF |
|
September 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
DISMISS SETTLEMENT BEFORE HEARING W/ PREJ 9/15/11 CEB. USER ID=NEWSOMEF |
|
August 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION 08/01/2011 1 PM. USER ID=MALLARDJ |
|
August 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION MEDIATION. USER ID=NEWSOMEF |
|
July 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION FIFTH 08/01/11 @ 1:00 PM. USER ID=MARTNEZ |
|
July 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION USER ID=VIRGILS |
|
June 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION FIRST. USER ID=VIRGILS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.