Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Arch Bay Holdings Llc-Series 2009B, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Mcleod, Teresa L, Capital One Bank Usa Na, Pat Acres Civic Assn Inc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Judge, Senior presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2010 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - NO LONGER IN PROCESS
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING VERIFICATION
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE RETURNED TO HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
July 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED POSTED BEATRICE L MCLEOD 7/9/12 Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
July 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED HCSO CK 67627 Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
July 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON - TO - FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION 7/2/12 JMB Judge: Judge, Senior |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.