Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gte Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Lamott, James, Hoyt, Michael, Hoyt, Steven, Hoyt, David, Leonard, Barbara, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Pendino, D. Sam presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2010 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
April 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
April 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
April 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
April 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
April 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF FORECLOSURE SALE DOS 04/16/12 10AM Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.