Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ocwen Loan Servicing, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Manne, Brian H, Manne, Anita L, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Judge, Senior presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2010 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
January 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER RETURNED ORIGINAL NOTE, MORTGAGE AND ASSIGNENT OF MORTGAGE TO: KASS SHULER, 1505 N FLORIDA, TAMPA, FL 33602 (ENV FEDEX TRK#: 496485845071) PER ORDER SIGNED ON 01/09/2014 BY RCP Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
January 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE New File Transfer to R/C; Boxed in p/u area 01/17/14 to be picked up Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
January 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON - TO - FOR
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
July 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF FORECLOSURE SALE DOS 08/01/13 10AM Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
July 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
JUDICIAL SALE CANCELLED
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
July 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF JUDICIAL SALE DOS 08/01/2013 AM FAXED BY ATTY Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
July 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE BUSINESS OBSERVER Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
June 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
June 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Judge: Judge, Senior |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.