Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Financial System Florida, Incc O Corporation Service Co, R.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Mcclelland, Loni M, Harbour Island Community Services Assn Inc, Plaza Harbour Island Condo Assn Inc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Isom, R. Claudia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2010 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
May 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE New Disposal file in transit to the Record Center- Pick-up Date 5/28/2013 Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
February 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF FILING COPY OF THE ORDER DISMISSING ACTION, RELEASING LIS PENDENS AND DIRECTING CLERK TO RETURN ORIGINAL DOCS ATCHD Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
January 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.