Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pardo, Juan, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Gonzalez, Armando, Moya, Maria, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Pendino, D. Sam presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2010 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC 1vol Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
FILE RETURNED TO HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN REQUESTING DEPT - CSC - ROOM #101
Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT CSC 1 Vol Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RC - SEND TO CSC - ROOM #101 MICHAELA MATTHEWS Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
May 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF EXHIBIT DISPOSAL MAILED Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RETURNED TO HOME LOCATION - RC File Returning to R/C; Boxed in p/u area 12/31/13 to be picked up Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
December 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - SEND TO CIRCUIT CIVIL Melanie Ware - Redact Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
December 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT
Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.