Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hsbc Mortgage Services, Inc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Kirwan, Jessica Ann, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Arnold, D. James presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2010 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
May 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE New Disposal file in transit to the Record Center- Pick-up Date 5/28/2013 Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
April 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=RODRIGZ Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
April 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING. USER ID=MANGUALLI Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
April 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND CANCELLATION OF LIS PENDENS W/CHECK # 274379 W/O PREJ. USER ID=MANGUALLI Judge: Arnold, D. James |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.