Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lhr Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Ramsingh, Kris M, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Barbas, Rex presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2010 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC AS PART OF FILE RELOCATION PROJECT Judge: Barbas, Rex |
|
June 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
BANKRUPTCY
Judge: Barbas, Rex |
|
June 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED UNEXECUTED LHR INC. Judge: Barbas, Rex |
|
June 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
SEE DOCKET TEXT PRAECIPE FOR SERVICE Judge: Barbas, Rex |
|
June 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBIT 1. PRESS RELEASE FROM THE ATTY GENERAL OF NY - EXHIBIT 2. PRESS RELEASE FROM THE OFICE OF THE ATTY GENERAL OF NY SETTLING WITH PLNTF, LHR INC ATTACHED Judge: Barbas, Rex |
|
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Judge: Barbas, Rex |
|
December 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED NOT SERVED
Judge: Barbas, Rex |
|
October 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE KRIS M RAMSING. USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Barbas, Rex |
|
September 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR PLTFS / FOR CONTEMPT 20 DAYS 09/27/11 JDA. USER ID=MANGUALLI Judge: Barbas, Rex |
|
August 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER. USER ID=GRAHAMD Judge: Barbas, Rex |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.