Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bankunited, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Johnston, Jerry A, Johnston, Sheri L, Westshore Club Ii Inc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Barton, M. James presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2010 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE USER ID=ALVAREZJE Judge: Barton, M. James |
|
October 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING USER ID=ALVAREZJE Judge: Barton, M. James |
|
October 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS USER ID=ALVAREZJE Judge: Barton, M. James |
|
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
JUDICIAL SALE USER ID=CARVALHORE Judge: Barton, M. James |
|
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE USER ID=MCCLENDON Judge: Barton, M. James |
|
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION DOS 9-20-11 AM. USER ID=MCCLENDON Judge: Barton, M. James |
|
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING USER ID=MCCLENDON Judge: Barton, M. James |
|
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT RCPT - RECEIPT. 20-SEP-2011,$70.00, User Id = CARVALHORE, Receipt No = 2117080. USER ID=CARVALHORE Judge: Barton, M. James |
|
August 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=RODRIGZ Judge: Barton, M. James |
|
August 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT DOS 9/20/2011 AM JMB 8/18/2011. USER ID=ALVAREZJE Judge: Barton, M. James |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.