Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sui, Hongjin, Dalian Hoffen Bio-Tecnique Co Ltd, filed a(n) Slander,Libel,Defamation - Torts case against Wu, Harry, Laogai Research Foundation, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Bergmann, E. Charles presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2010 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeSlander,Libel,Defamation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2012 | Docket Event | FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC | |
November 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE Circuit Civil New Disposal to be sent to the R/C is in a box by the R/C pick up area. |
|
January 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT USER ID=MALLARDJ |
|
January 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
DO NOT ENTER ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS USER ID=MALLARDJ |
|
January 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE BRIAN M SILVERIO. USER ID=MALLARDJ |
|
December 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED X2. USER ID=MILLSL |
|
December 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT RCPT - RECEIPT. 08-DEC-2010,$420.00, User Id = MILLSL, Receipt No = 1951895. USER ID=MILLSL |
|
December 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT USER ID=MILLSL |
|
December 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET USER ID=MILLSL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.