Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Carothers, Amanda L, Carothers, Richard F.D., Ii, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Alpha Excavating & Equipment Rental, Inc, Martin, Ginger Ellen, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Stephens, Scott. Steven presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2010 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event | FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC | |
May 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE New Disposal file in transit to the Record Center- Pick-up Date 5/28/2013 |
|
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS | |
December 16, 2011 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL | |
December 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO JUDGE FROM PHIL S. YURECKA |
|
December 16, 2011 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER | |
November 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION 11/22/11 @ 4:30PM FRANCISCO GOMES, MD |
|
November 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION 11/21/11 @ 2:30PM ROBERT MARTINEZ, MD |
|
November 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM RETURNED SERVED ROBERT MARTINEZ MD |
|
November 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM RETURNED SERVED FRANCISCO GOMES MD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.