Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Farm Fire And Casualty Companyc O Chief Financial Officer, Ra, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Foreman, William A, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Arnold, D. James presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2010 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE New File Transfer to R/C; Boxed 6/27/13 in R/C pick-up area. Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION AFTER HEARING
Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
April 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION
Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
January 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF BORROWER NON PARTICIPATION
Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
September 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED WILLIAM A FOREMAN 09/14/11. USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
September 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED X 1. USER ID=PHILLIPSV Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
September 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT RCPT - RECEIPT. 02-SEP-2011,$10.00, User Id = PHILLIPSV, Receipt No = 2107398. USER ID=PHILLIPSV Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
September 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE ANGELA C DONA. USER ID=PHILLIPSV Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
August 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT C311 - ORDER ON MOTION. PLTFS / TO EXTEND TIME IN ORDER TO OBTAIN SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFT 120 DAYS 08/26/11 JDA. USER ID=MANGUALLI Judge: Arnold, D. James |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.