Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hillsborough County Sheriffs Office, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case against Amt Two Thousand 445 Dollars, Jimenez, Jose, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Pendino, D. Sam presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 2010 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
May 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE New Disposal file in transit to the Record Center- Pick-up Date 5/28/2013 Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
July 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=RODRIGZ Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL USER ID=MANGUALLI Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM DISMISSED PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT - BEFORE HEARING. USER ID=MANGUALLI Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ENTERED JOSE JIMENEZ. USER ID=ALVESPA Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
February 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION USER ID=MALLARDJ Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
February 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FORFEITURE PROCEEDINGS JOSE JIMENEZ AND ALL PERSONS WHO CLAIM AN INTEREST IN 2,445.00. USER ID=MALLARDJ Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
ANSWER KATRINA MOREJON FOR JOSE JIMENEZ (DOCUMENT UNSIGNED). USER ID=COLEMANTA Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
January 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FORFEITURE PROCEEDINGS USER ID=MALLARDJ Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.