Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hsbc Bank Usa, Na As Trustee On Behalf Of The Ace Securities Corp Home Equity Loan Trust, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Gonzalez, Sofia, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Stephens, Scott. Steven presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING VERIFICATION
Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC 1 VOL Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE RETURNED TO HOME LOCATION - RC 1 VOL Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC 1 vol Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE RETURNED TO HOME LOCATION - RC The file is located in the pickup area to be transported to the R/C... Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - NO LONGER IN PROCESS R2D2 Case validation process Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN REQUESTING DEPT - CPC-CIV - ROOM #103
Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO MARCUS SUTTLE CPC RM 103 RE: VERIFICATION -1 vol Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION TEAM Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.