Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Farm Mutual Auto Insur Co, Johnston, Victoria, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Samla, Jason Narindra, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Silver, C. Bernard presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE Circuit Civil New Disposal in Transit to the R/C. Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
June 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=CUSHMAN Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
June 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT PLTF SHALL RECOVER FROM DEFT JASON NARINDRA SAMLA, JR., THE PRINCIPAL SUM WITH COURT COSTS & INTEREST 06/14/11 BCS. USER ID=ALVESPA Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
June 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM DISPOSED BY JUDGE. USER ID=MANGUALLI Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
June 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT USER ID=MANGUALLI Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
June 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE ERIC L HOSTETLER, ESQ RE: FINAL JUDGMENT. USER ID=MANGUALLI Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
June 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS USER ID=MANGUALLI Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
June 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM USER ID=MANGUALLI Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
January 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS USER ID=MANGUALLI Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.