Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Chase Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Perneczky, George C, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Arnold, D. James presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=RODRIGZ Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
July 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CD612 - JUDGMENT OF DISM (AFTER HRG).. 7-14-11 JDA. USER ID=DLORETOSU Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
April 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION JULY 14.2011 @ 3:00 PM ROOM 514, JUDGE ARNOLD. USER ID=KINGJU Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
January 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED PERNECZKY, GEORGE C. 01/04/10. USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
January 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
ANSWER FROM GEORGE PERNECZKY. USER ID=MCDOWELL Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
January 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED X 1. USER ID=KINGJU Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
January 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT RCPT - RECEIPT. 04-JAN-2010,$410.00, User Id = KINGJU, Receipt No = 1729956. USER ID=KINGJU Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
January 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED NEW CASE FILING
Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
December 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET USER ID=KINGJU Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
December 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT USER ID=STMARIAM Judge: Arnold, D. James |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.