Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Us Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Miranda, Manuel A, Island Club At Rocky Point Condo Assn Inc, Asset Acceptance Llc, Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc1901 E Voorhees St., Ste. C, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Judge, Senior presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC AS PART OF FILE RELOCATION PROJECT Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
May 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
May 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
May 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
March 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE TO UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1 / COPY CERTIFICATE OF SALE Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
March 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE TO MANUEL A MIRANDA / COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF SALE Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
March 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
BID INFORMATION SHEET
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
March 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Fee Worksheet
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
March 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Judge: Judge, Senior |
|
March 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE
Judge: Judge, Senior |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.