Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Co, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Montesinos, Frank, Montesinos, Mirley, Diaz, Jennifer, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Div M, Senior Judge presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
August 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
BANKRUPTCY
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED TO AN ELECTRONIC FILE Paper converted electronically and destroyed in accordance with minimum standards for image reproduction in Rules 1B-26.0021 and 1B-26.003, Florida Administrative Code and Record (master) copy requirements set forth in Section 92.29, Florida Statutes Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
October 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
October 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
DEPOSIT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE ACCOUNT BALANCE PAID $47,310.00 DOC STAMPS $348.60 REG FEE $754.50 Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
October 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
October 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.