Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Redus Florida Housing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Keystone Homes Inc, Mcclain, Wayne A, Townhomes At West Hampton Owners Assn Inc, Universal Fire Systems Inc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Div M, Senior Judge presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDiv M, Senior Judge Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: April 16, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION TEAM Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
April 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
April 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
January 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
January 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE RETURNED TO HOME LOCATION - RC File in transit to the Record Center Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
January 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING 01/20/12 @ 9:00 AM Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.