Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bac Home Loans, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Ramirez, Frank, Grand Reserve Condo Assn At Tampa, Countrywide Home Loans Inc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Div M, Senior Judge presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION TEAM Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE New File Sent to R/C Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE The new file is in the pick up area to be transported to the R/C... Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
February 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
February 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING - SETTLEMENT Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.