Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ditech Financial Llc F K A Green Tree Se, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Lake Forest Hoa Inc, Endrzejewski, Richard C, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Cook, J.. Martha presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION TEAM Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE Circuit Civil New Disposal in Transit to the R/C. Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
October 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=RODRIGZ Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
October 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJ CHECK NO. 0017556 . USER ID=NEWSOMEF Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
October 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE VONTAE BROWN. USER ID=NEWSOMEF Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.