Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Christiana Trust, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Ketchum, Jason B, Country Place Community Assn Inc, Suncoast Schools Federal Credit Union, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Pendino, D. Sam presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION TEAM Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
June 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RETURN OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
June 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE MAILED TO: SHAPIRO FISHMAN & GACHE LLP 4630 WOODLAND CORP BV STE 100 TAMPA FL 33614 PER ORDER SIGNED 061311 JRP. USER ID=WAGNERC Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
June 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=RODRIGZ Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
June 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CD993 - CLOSED FOR SRS. USER ID=ALVESPA Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
June 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER DIRECTING TO RETURN ORIGINAL DOCS (ORIGINAL NOTE & ORIGINAL MORTGAGE) 06/13/11 JRP. USER ID=ALVESPA Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.