Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Financial System Florida, Incc O Corporation Service Co, R.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Ceballos, Daniel S, Mccauley, Dulce, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Div M, Senior Judge presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDiv M, Senior Judge Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE New File Sent to R/C Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Fee Worksheet
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
BID INFORMATION SHEET
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
October 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE BUSINESS OBSERVER Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.