Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Woodward, Christine, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case against Hillsborough County Florida, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Cook, J.. Martha presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE New File being sent to R/C; Located at R/C pickup area. |
|
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF SECOND MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME AND NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE AGAINST HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY FLORIDA |
|
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO CLERK FROM JAMES S CURTIS ESQ |
|
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM OTHER - PLTF DECEASED |
|
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME SECOND AND NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE |
|
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO CLERK FROM JAMES S. CURTIS |
|
August 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR PLTFS / FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME 90 DAYS 08/23/11 RAF. USER ID=MANGUALLI |
|
August 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE JAMES S CURTIS RE: ENLARGMENT OF TIME. USER ID=MANGUALLI |
|
August 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME USER ID=MANNTI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.