Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Financial System Florida, Incc O Corporation Service Co, R.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Egal, Ryan M, Egal, Maria, Panther Trace Ii Hoa Inc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Wolfe, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION TEAM Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
March 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE RETURNED TO HOME LOCATION - RC File Returning to R/C; Boxed in p/u area 3/4/14 to be picked up Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
March 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN REQUESTING DEPT - CIRCUIT CIVIL
Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - SEND TO CIRCUIT CIVIL Copy Clerk Desk Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT
Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.