Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Provident Funding Assocs Lp, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Liles, Marc A, Liles, Renee D, Sundance Association Inc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Cook, J.. Martha presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCook, J.. Martha Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED FINANCIAL HISTORY Fund Date Invoice Interface Amount GLActivity Description F05911 06/16/2011 _______ F0003440 _____5000.00 Credit 09-CA-032643 F05911 06/17/2011 _______ F0003441 ____94050.00 Credit 09-CA-032643 Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
July 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING USER ID=MCCLENDON Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS USER ID=MCCLENDON Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
June 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE USER ID=MCCLENDON Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
June 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT RCPT - RECEIPT. 17-JUN-2011,$95543.25, User Id = WIGGSJ, Receipt No = 2065148. USER ID=WIGGSJ Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
June 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING USER ID=SHELLMANDE Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
June 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
JUDICIAL SALE USER ID=WIGGSJ Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
June 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT RCPT - RECEIPT. 16-JUN-2011,$70.00, User Id = WIGGSJ, Receipt No = 2064390. USER ID=WIGGSJ Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
June 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT RCPT - RECEIPT. 16-JUN-2011,$5000.00, User Id = WIGGSJ, Receipt No = 2064575. USER ID=WIGGSJ Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
June 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION DOS 06-16-2011 @AM. USER ID=WIGGSJ Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.