Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Co, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Cole, Charlene, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Stephens, Scott. Steven presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephens, Scott. Steven Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION TEAM Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED FINANCIAL HISTORY Fund Date Invoice Interface Amount GLActivity Description F05520 12/09/2010 _______ F0003289 _____7000.00 Credit 09-CA-032624 F05520 12/10/2010 _______ F0003290 ___132510.00 Credit 09-CA-032624 Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
January 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING USER ID=MCCLENDON Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
January 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS USER ID=MCCLENDON Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
December 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE USER ID=SUTTLEM Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
DEPOSIT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE ACCOUNT BALANCE DUE $132510.00 REG FEE $2100.15 DOC STAMP FEE $977.20. USER ID=PATERSNF Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.