Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Ulloa Ruiz, Juan Carlos, Ulloa, Majorie, Capital One Bank, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Cook, J.. Martha presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCook, J.. Martha Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION TEAM Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
June 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED POSTED ULLOA RUIZ, JUAN C.. USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
April 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED HCSO CK 40687. USER ID=HIPSON Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
April 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=RODRIGZ Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
April 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT ROPEN - CASE REOPENED. USER ID=CUSHMAN Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
April 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION USER ID=NEWSOMEF Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.