Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Community National Bank At Bartow Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Berry, William C, Berry, Patricia A, Lakeland Regional Mortgage Copr, American Home Loan Center Llc, Centric Mortgage, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Div M, Senior Judge presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDiv M, Senior Judge Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
PAPER CASE FILE DESTROYED - DIGITIZED Paper document converted to electronic image(s) destroyed per requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.525(c)(2)(B); (c)(2)(F); and (c)(4) Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
August 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
July 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC--- IMAGED FILE
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
FINAL ORDER
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
August 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR DEFICIENCY JUDGMENT; 10/8/14 @ 9AM; ROOM 409 Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING 08/26/2014 9:30 AM Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
August 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
CASE IMAGE AND VERIFIED AS OF THIS DATE
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
July 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.