Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kondaur Capital Corp, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against State Of Florida, Blount, Carolann Heayn, Blount, Johnny Oneal, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Bergmann, E. Charles presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBergmann, E. Charles Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION TEAM Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
May 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
May 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE Circuit Civil New Disposal is in transit to the Record Center Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
February 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
COPY OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
January 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
January 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT # 1. USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.