Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
U.S.Bank National Association.Dept Foreclosure Select Portfolio Servicing Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Pabon, Carmelo, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Arnold, D. James presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArnold, D. James Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION TEAM Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE Circuit Civil New Disposal in Transit to the R/C. Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
August 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=RODRIGZ Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
August 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING. USER ID=MANGUALLI Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
August 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJ AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS W/CHECK # 32535. USER ID=MANGUALLI Judge: Arnold, D. James |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.