Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Detres, Francisco, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Florida Peninsula Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Silver, C. Bernard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSilver, C. Bernard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2009 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC AS PART OF FILE RELOCATION PROJECT |
|
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING 7/15/14 3PM |
|
May 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 7/15/14 3PM - PLTF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF SOIL SAMPLES & PLTF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS OF DFDT'S CORP REP, CLAIMS MGR, AND EXPERT WITNESSES - ROOM 514 |
|
May 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION 5/27/14 @1PM |
|
May 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES |
|
May 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, FLORIDA PENINSULA INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
May 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOS OF DFDTS CORP REP CLAIMS MANAGER AND EXPERT WITNESSES |
|
May 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
WITNESS LIST DFDT'S |
|
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event | WITNESS LIST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.