Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bauman, Mary W, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Rockey, Brett M, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Wolfe, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
July 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RETURNED TO HOME LOCATION - RC File Returning to R/C; Boxed 7/23/13 in R/C pick-up area. Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
July 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN REQUESTING DEPT - CIRCUIT CIVIL
Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
July 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT
Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
July 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - SEND TO CIRCUIT CIVIL ANGELA GARY ONM Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE Circuit Civil New Disposal in Transit to the R/C. Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=RODRIGZ Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
November 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM USER ID=NEWSOMEF Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
November 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL 11/23/10 MJC. USER ID=NEWSOMEF Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.