Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rodriguez, Francisco, Rodriguez, Marie, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Universal Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Bergmann, E. Charles presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBergmann, E. Charles Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2009 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event | FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC | |
December 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE Circuit Civil New Disposal to be sent to the R/C is in a box by the R/C pick up area. |
|
October 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=RODRIGZ |
|
October 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
DISMISS SETTLEMENT BEFORE HEARING 10/11/10 CEB. USER ID=DIGGSL |
|
October 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL USER ID=DIGGSL |
|
July 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY ENTIRE MONTH OF JULY, 2010. USER ID=GRAHAMD |
|
June 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE USER ID=WARRENB |
|
April 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT UNIVERSAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA/AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL. USER ID=GRAHAMD |
|
April 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY 06/21/2010 - 06/25/2010. USER ID=MALLARDJ |
|
March 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT RCPT - RECEIPT. 01-MAR-2010,$10.00, User Id = HIPSON, Receipt No = 1769818. USER ID=HIPSON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.