Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Diaz, Heriberto L, Diaz, Liuva, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Cooperativa De Seguros Multiples De Puerto Rico Inc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Isom, Claudia. R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIsom, Claudia. R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Isom, Claudia. R |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE Circuit Civil New Disposal is in transit to the Record Center. Judge: Isom, Claudia. R |
|
June 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION AFTER HEARING
Judge: Isom, Claudia. R |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: Isom, Claudia. R |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO CLERK FROM DONNA J SANZ, FRP Judge: Isom, Claudia. R |
|
April 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION JUNE 22, 2012 at 9:00A.M. Judge: Isom, Claudia. R |
|
April 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION
Judge: Isom, Claudia. R |
|
February 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT. USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Isom, Claudia. R |
|
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL HEARING APRIL 15, 2011 @ 9:30A.M. @ HONORABLE JUDGE D.M.SISCO. USER ID=WHALEY Judge: Isom, Claudia. R |
|
February 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT ATTACHED. USER ID=MALLARDJ Judge: Isom, Claudia. R |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.